Committee for the Environment
2007 - 2011 Mandate - Members' Attendance at Committee Meetings
Members attendance at committee meetings held between 01/09/2010 and 28/02/2011
Member | Total number of meetings held | Maximum number of meetings that could be attended | Meetings attended | % Attendance |
---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Cathal Boylan, Chairperson |
31
|
31
|
30
|
96.8%
|
Mr Patsy McGlone , Deputy Chairperson |
31
|
31
|
29
|
93.5%
|
Mr Roy Beggs (until 31/10/10) |
31
|
10
|
10
|
100.0%
|
Mr Jonathan Bell (until 12/09/10) |
31
|
2
|
1
|
50.0%
|
Mr Thomas Buchanan (from 13/09/10) |
31
|
29
|
21
|
72.4%
|
Mr Trevor Clarke (from 13/09/10) |
31
|
29
|
20
|
69.0%
|
Mr Willie Clarke (from 13/09/10) |
31
|
29
|
23
|
79.3%
|
Mr John Dallat |
31
|
31
|
19
|
61.3%
|
Mr Danny Kinahan |
31
|
31
|
26
|
83.9%
|
Mr Ian McCrea (until 12/09/10) |
31
|
2
|
1
|
50.0%
|
Mr Daithi McKay |
31
|
2
|
0
|
0.0%
|
Mr Alastair Ross |
31
|
31
|
22
|
71.0%
|
Mr George Savage (from 1/11/10) |
31
|
21
|
7
|
33.3%
|
Mr Peter Weir |
31
|
31
|
28
|
90.3%
|
Mr Brian Wilson |
31
|
31
|
26
|
83.9%
|
Totals | 341 | 263 | 77.1% |
Members attendance at committee meetings held between 01/09/2009 and 31/08/2010
Member | Total number of meetings held | Maximum number of meetings that could be attended | Meetings attended | % Attendance |
---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Dolores Kelly, Chairperson (until 11/04/10) * |
40
|
28
|
25
|
89.3%
|
Mr Cathal Boylan, Chairperson (from 12/04/10) and Deputy Chairperson (until 11/04/10) |
40
|
40
|
36
|
90.0%
|
Mr Dominic Bradley, Deputy Chairperson (from 12/04/10 until 20/05/10) |
40
|
5
|
0
|
0.0%
|
Mr Patsy McGlone, Deputy Chairperson (from 21/05/10) |
40
|
7
|
5
|
71.4%
|
Mr Roy Beggs |
40
|
40
|
39
|
97.5%
|
Mr Jonathan Bell (from 01/02/10) |
40
|
22
|
16
|
72.7%
|
Mr Trevor Clarke (until 13/09/09) |
40
|
1
|
0
|
0.0%
|
Mr John Dallat |
40
|
40
|
35
|
87.5%
|
Mr David Ford (until 12/04/10) |
40
|
28
|
23
|
82.1%
|
Mr Danny Kinahan |
40
|
40
|
33
|
82.5%
|
Mr Ian McCrea |
40
|
40
|
29
|
72.5%
|
Mr Daithi McKay |
40
|
40
|
18
|
45.0%
|
Mr Adrian McQuillan (from 14/09/09 until 31/01/10) |
40
|
17
|
8
|
47.1%
|
Mr Alastair Ross |
40
|
40
|
36
|
90.0%
|
Mr Peter Weir |
40
|
40
|
33
|
82.5%
|
Mr Brian Wilson (from 13/04/10) |
40
|
12
|
9
|
75.0%
|
Totals |
|
440
|
345
|
78.4%
|
* Ms Dolores Kelly, Chairperson with effect from 03/07/09
Members attendance at committee meetings held between 01/09/2008 and 31/08/2009
Member | Total number of meetings held | Maximum number of meetings that could be attended | Meetings attended | % Attendance |
---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Patsy McGlone,* Chairperson (until 03/07/09) | 36 | 36 | 32 | 88.9% |
Mr Cathal Boylan, Deputy Chairperson | 36 | 36 | 32 | 88.9% |
Mr Billy Armstrong (until 29/09/08) | 36 | 3 | 2 | 66.7% |
Mr Roy Beggs (from 15/09/08) | 36 | 35 | 33 | 94.3% |
Mr Trevor Clarke | 36 | 36 | 29 | 80.6% |
Mr John Dallat (from 29/06/09) | 36 | 1 | 1 | 100.0% |
Mr David Ford | 36 | 36 | 31 | 86.1% |
Mr Tommy Gallagher (until 29/06/09) | 36 | 35 | 26 | 74.3% |
Mr Sam Gardiner (until 15/09/08) | 36 | 1 | 1 | 100.0% |
Mr Danny Kinahan (from 22/06/09) | 36 | 2 | 2 | 100.0% |
Mr David McClarty (from 29/09/08) (until 22/06/09) | 36 | 31 | 22 | 71.0% |
Mr Ian McCrea | 36 | 36 | 32 | 88.9% |
Mr Daithi McKay | 36 | 36 | 17 | 47.2% |
Mr Alastair Ross | 36 | 36 | 32 | 88.9% |
Mr Peter Weir | 36 | 36 | 27 | 75.0% |
Totals | 396 | 319 | 80.6% |
Members attendance at committee meetings held between 03/09/2007 and 31/08 /2008
Member | Total number of meetings held | Maximum number of meetings that could be attended | Meetings attended | % Attendance |
---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Patsy McGlone, Chairperson | 40 | 40 | 39 | 97.5% |
Mr Cathal Boylan, Deputy Chairperson | 40 | 40 | 35 | 87.5% |
Mr Billy Armstrong | 40 | 40 | 27 | 67.5% |
Mr Trevor Clarke | 40 | 40 | 31 | 77.5% |
Mr David Ford | 40 | 40 | 39 | 97.5% |
Mr Tommy Gallagher | 40 | 40 | 32 | 80.0% |
Mr Sam Gardiner | 40 | 40 | 28 | 70.0% |
Mr Alex Maskey (until 21/01/08) | 40 | 16 | 3 | 18.8% |
Mr Ian McCrea | 40 | 40 | 37 | 92.5% |
Mr Daithi McKay | 40 | 40 | 11 | 27.5% |
Mr Alastair Ross (from 21/01/08) | 40 | 24 | 24 | 100% |
Mr Peter Weir | 40 | 40 | 33 | 82.5% |